Henry v. USS-POSCO Industries, a California Corporation

Plaintiff: Elizabeth aka Shelly Henry
Defendant: USS-POSCO Industries
Case Number: 3:2016cv01939
Filed: April 13, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/16/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
July 25, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 21 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/25/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016)
April 22, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/14/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/21/2016 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/22/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry v. USS-POSCO Industries, a California Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth aka Shelly Henry
Represented By: Beth Wolf Mora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USS-POSCO Industries
Represented By: Traci L Bernard-Marks
Represented By: Bonnie A. Glatzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?