Raul Huerta v. City and County of San Francisco et al

Plaintiff: Raul Huerta
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco and The Arc San Francisco, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv01943
Filed: April 13, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2017 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 49 Stipulation Dismissing Action in its Entirety. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2017)
May 25, 2017 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 38 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PETITION APPROVING COMPROMISE OF A CLAIM FOR A PERSON WITH A DISABILITY. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
March 6, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. Case Management Statement due by 3/20/2017; Further Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2017 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 3/6/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2017)
May 5, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 6 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad litem ad Litem. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raul Huerta v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Huerta
Represented By: Irakli M. Karbelashvili
Represented By: Irene Lenislav Karbelashvili
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: David W. Ammons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Arc San Francisco, Inc.
Represented By: Arthur W. Curley
Represented By: Peter Frederick Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?