Love v. Salinas Valley State Prison

Plaintiff: Kennard Isaiah Love
Defendant: Salinas Valley State Prison
Case Number: 3:2016cv01981
Filed: April 14, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Luis Obispo
Referring Judge: PSLC AGB
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 1, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 17 Motion to Dismiss. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
August 31, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF SERVICE re 11 Amended Complaint filed by Kennard Isaiah Love. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/31/16. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2016)
June 1, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH LEAVE TO AMEND re 1 Complaint, filed by Kennard Isaiah Love. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/1/16. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Love v. Salinas Valley State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kennard Isaiah Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salinas Valley State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?