Santini v. Wells Fargo Bank

Plaintiff: Lindsay Santini
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Case Number: 3:2016cv01992
Filed: April 15, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/23/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2016)
July 22, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RELATE. C16-1992 GYR (Santini v. Wells Fargo) does not relate to C15-2321 EMC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/22/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2016)
May 27, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/27/16. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santini v. Wells Fargo Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsay Santini
Represented By: Walter Lewis Haines
Represented By: David Roger Markham
Represented By: Janine Renee Menhennet
Represented By: Peggy J. Reali
Represented By: Maggie K. Realin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Represented By: Theresa Ann Kading
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?