Siddqui et al v. City of Fremont Community Development Department-Planning Division et al

Plaintiff: Abrar Elahi Siddqui and Rahila Khan
Defendant: City of Fremont, City of Fremont Community Development Department and Leonard Powell
Case Number: 3:2016cv02012
Filed: April 17, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 05:7703
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 25, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 8/29/2016. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/8/2016 at 09:00 AM, Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/25/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2016)
August 3, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/3/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2016)
July 25, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause. Response due by 8/1/2016.Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on July 25, 2016. (jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016)
July 18, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/18/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Siddqui et al v. City of Fremont Community Development Department-Planning Division et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abrar Elahi Siddqui
Represented By: Brian Kemp Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rahila Khan
Represented By: Brian Kemp Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Fremont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Fremont Community Development Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?