Prosterman et al v. Airline Tariff Publishing Company, et al

Plaintiff: Cynthia Prosterman, Jan Marie Brown, Carolyn Fjord, Katherine R. Arcell, Keith Dean Bradt, Judy Bray, Jose M. Brito, Robert D. Conway, Judy Crandall, Rosemary D'Augusta, Brenda K. Davis, Pamela Faust, Don Freeland, Donna Fry, Gabriel Garavanian, Harry Garavanian, Yvonne Jocelyn Gardner, Lee M. Gentry, Valarie Ann Jolly, Gail S. Kosach, John Lovell, Michael C. Malaney, Len Marazzo, Lisa McCarthy, Patricia Ann Meeuwsen, L. West Oehmig, Jr., Deborah M. Pulfer, Dana L. Robinson, Robert A. Rosenthal, Bill Rubinsohn, Sondra K. Russell, Sylvia N. Sparks, June Stansbury, Clyde D. Stensrud, Wayne Taleff, Gary Talewsky, Annette M. Tippetts, Diana Lynn Ultican, J. Michael Walker, Pamela S. Ward and Christine Whalen
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc., Airline Tariff Publishing Company, Delta Air Lines, Inc. and United Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv02017
Filed: April 18, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2017 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ORDER INDICATING COURT WILL ENTERTAIN PLAINTIFFS' RULE 60(B) MOTION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 5, 2017. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2017)
February 13, 2017 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT AND/OR TO ALTER OR AMEND JUDGMENT; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 13, 2017. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
December 8, 2016 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 8, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
August 18, 2016 92 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 18, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2016)
July 20, 2016 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PERMITTING CHARTS AT JULY 22, 2016 HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 20, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
July 18, 2016 79 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING RULE 26 DEADLINES. The deadline for Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures and Rule 26(f) report is rescheduled to August 19, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 18, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
July 5, 2016 77 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CHANGING HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The hearing on defendants' motions to dismiss scheduled for July 8, 2016 is continued and rescheduled for July 22, 2016. In light thereof, the Initial Case Management Conference is continued to August 26, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 5, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)
June 22, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT DELTA AIR LINES, INC.'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW JOHN F. COVE, JR. AS COUNSEL OF RECORD. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 22, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2016)
May 13, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 13, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 5, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF GIL D. MESSINA PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 5, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
May 4, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION OF THEIR REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Plaintiffs are granted relief from Local Rule 7-4(b) and may exceed the page limitations prescribed therein by no more than five pages. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 4, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2016)
April 29, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF DEE BANSAL PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 29, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
April 25, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF MICHAEL MITCHELL PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 25, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2016)
April 18, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MOTION FOR ORDER TEMPORARILY RESTRAINING DEFENDANTS FROM VIOLATING SECTION 1 OF SHERMAN ANTITRUST ACT AND SECTION 16720 OF THE CALIFORNIA CARTWRIGHT ANTITRUST ACT; ORDERING DEFENDANTS TO SHOW CAUSE; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS. This Ord er and supporting papers must be served by Plaintiffs on Defendants as soon as possible, but no later than April 19, 2016. Any response or opposition to this Order to Show Cause must be filed and served on Plaintiffs' counsel no later than April 29, 2016, and any reply must be filed no later than May 4, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 18, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prosterman et al v. Airline Tariff Publishing Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Represented By: Elif Kimyacioglu
Represented By: Farrell James Malone
Represented By: Daniel Murray Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airline Tariff Publishing Company
Represented By: Deepti Bansal
Represented By: David Scott Burns
Represented By: Jon Francis Cieslak
Represented By: John C. Dwyer
Represented By: John Parker Erkmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Represented By: John F. Cove, Jr.
Represented By: James P. Denvir, III
Represented By: Michael S. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Naomi Gaspar
Represented By: Joshua Hill, Jr.
Represented By: Peter K. Huston
Represented By: Vikram S Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Prosterman
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan Marie Brown
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Fjord
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine R. Arcell
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Dean Bradt
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Bray
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose M. Brito
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert D. Conway
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Crandall
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary D'Augusta
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda K. Davis
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Faust
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Freeland
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Fry
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Garavanian
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Garavanian
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Jocelyn Gardner
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee M. Gentry
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valarie Ann Jolly
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail S. Kosach
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lovell
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael C. Malaney
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Len Marazzo
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa McCarthy
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Ann Meeuwsen
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. West Oehmig, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah M. Pulfer
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana L. Robinson
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A. Rosenthal
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Rubinsohn
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sondra K. Russell
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia N. Sparks
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: June Stansbury
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clyde D. Stensrud
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Taleff
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Talewsky
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette M. Tippetts
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Lynn Ultican
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Michael Walker
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela S. Ward
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Whalen
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?