Papasan et al v. Dometic Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Catherine Papasan, Nelson Goehle, Andrew Young, Jimmy Byers and Christopher Johnston
Defendant: Dometic Corporation and Dometic LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv02117
Filed: April 21, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 4, 2017 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 76 Motion for Leave to File Response to Defendant's Statement of Recent Decision. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
August 2, 2017 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 73 Motion for Leave to File Statement of Recent Decision. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2017)
April 21, 2017 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 69 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Emily R. Goebel. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2017)
September 29, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 51 Stipulated Protective Order. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2016)
July 18, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 40 Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
June 3, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 27 Stipulation to Exceed Page Limitations for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
May 3, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 21 Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2016)
April 29, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Steve W. Berman. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
April 28, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/28/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Papasan et al v. Dometic Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Papasan
Represented By: Terrence Allen Beard
Represented By: Ashley A Bede
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson Goehle
Represented By: Terrence Allen Beard
Represented By: Ashley A Bede
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Young
Represented By: Terrence Allen Beard
Represented By: Ashley A Bede
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Byers
Represented By: Terrence Allen Beard
Represented By: Ashley A Bede
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Johnston
Represented By: Terrence Allen Beard
Represented By: Ashley A Bede
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dometic Corporation
Represented By: Marcy Christina Priedeman
Represented By: Peter Allen Wald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dometic LLC
Represented By: Marcy Christina Priedeman
Represented By: Peter Allen Wald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?