Valencia v. SMX, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Amalia Valencia
Defendant: SMX, LLC, TRUEBLUE, INC and Amazon.Com, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv02155
Filed: April 21, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/19/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2016)
September 26, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part 28 Stipulation. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
September 7, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND re 26 Stipulation filed by Amalia Valencia, Amazon.Com, Inc.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/7/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valencia v. SMX, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMX, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRUEBLUE, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amalia Valencia
Represented By: Stanley Scott Mallison
Represented By: Marco A Palau
Represented By: Joseph Donald Sutton
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Trabucco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?