Murphy v. Trader Joe's

Plaintiff: DeShawn D. Murphy
Defendant: Trader Joe's
Case Number: 3:2016cv02222
Filed: April 25, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2017 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/18/17. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2017)
January 19, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES 30 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
July 21, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Motions terminated: 13 Ex Parte Application filed by Trader Joe's, 12 Ex Parte ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Continue Scheduled Case Management Conference and Filing of Case Management Statement filed by DeShawn D. Murphy. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/21/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Trader Joe's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeShawn D. Murphy
Represented By: Elizabeth Kristen
Represented By: William Clarence McNeill, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trader Joe's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?