Cobine et al v. City of Eureka et al

Plaintiff: Stacy Cobine, Nanette Dean, Christina Ruble, Lloyd Parker, Gerrianne Schulze, Sarah Hood, Aaron Kangas, Lynette Vera, Aubrey Short, Marie Anntonette Kinder and John Travis
Defendant: City of Eureka, Eureka Police Department and Andrew Mills
Case Number: 3:2016cv02239
Filed: April 25, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Humboldt
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 25, 2017 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White denying in part and granting in part 47 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
July 18, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 33 STIPULATION selecting Private ADR. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/18/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
May 2, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/2/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
April 28, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF QUESTIONS RE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 28, 2016. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
April 27, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/27/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2016)
April 26, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING as to 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants by 12:00 p.m. today, April 26, 2016 and shall file proof of that service with the Court. Res ponses due by 9:00 a.m. 4/28/2016. Replies due by 4:00 p.m. 4/28/2016. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/26/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2016) Modified on 4/26/2016 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cobine et al v. City of Eureka et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Cobine
Represented By: Shelley Kay Mack
Represented By: Peter Eric Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nanette Dean
Represented By: Shelley Kay Mack
Represented By: Peter Eric Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Ruble
Represented By: Shelley Kay Mack
Represented By: Peter Eric Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd Parker
Represented By: Shelley Kay Mack
Represented By: Peter Eric Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerrianne Schulze
Represented By: Shelley Kay Mack
Represented By: Peter Eric Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Hood
Represented By: Shelley Kay Mack
Represented By: Peter Eric Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Kangas
Represented By: Shelley Kay Mack
Represented By: Peter Eric Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynette Vera
Represented By: Shelley Kay Mack
Represented By: Peter Eric Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aubrey Short
Represented By: Shelley Kay Mack
Represented By: Peter Eric Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Anntonette Kinder
Represented By: Shelley Kay Mack
Represented By: Peter Eric Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Travis
Represented By: Shelley Kay Mack
Represented By: Peter Eric Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Eureka
Represented By: Cyndy Day-Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eureka Police Department
Represented By: Cyndy Day-Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Mills
Represented By: Cyndy Day-Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?