Koussa v. Curtis et al

Plaintiff: Pamela Koussa
Defendant: Philip J. Curtis, Linda J. Curtis and David Magna
Case Number: 3:2016cv02248
Filed: April 25, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 1, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO DISMISS CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/1/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2016)
July 22, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 13 Stipulation. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2016)
June 28, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 11 Stipulation to Dismiss Defendant Philip J. Curtis without prejudice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koussa v. Curtis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Koussa
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Dee Potter
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip J. Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda J. Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Magna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?