Chanel, Inc. v. Fu

Plaintiff: Chanel, Inc.
Defendant: Hsiao Yin Fu
Case Number: 3:2016cv02259
Filed: April 26, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2017 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 61 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
February 16, 2017 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 61 Supplemental Briefing and/or Evidence. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/16/2017. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2017)
September 9, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS. Case referred to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/9/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2016)
August 19, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 44 (Request to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Chanel, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 9/15/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/22/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/19/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
July 18, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 9/8/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/18/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
May 24, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Letter From Stephen Gaffigan, Dated May 20, 2016. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/24/2016. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
May 20, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND ORDER CONFIRMING SEIZURE. Case unsealed. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/20/16. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chanel, Inc. v. Fu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chanel, Inc.
Represented By: Ethan Isaac Jacobs
Represented By: Kenneth E. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hsiao Yin Fu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?