Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System v. SunEdison, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System
Defendant: SunEdison, Inc., Terraform Global, Inc., Ahmad Chatila, Brian Wuebbels, Carlos Domenech Zornoza, Martin Truong, Jeremy Avenier, Alejandro Hernandez, Emmanuel Hernandez, Antonio R. Alvarez, Peter Blackmore, Clayton Daley, Jr., Georganne Proctor, Steven Tesoriere, James B. Williams, Randy H. Zwirn, Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., BTG Pactual US Capital LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities Americas, Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC, Kotak Mahindra, Inc. and Itau BBA USA Securities, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv02267
Filed: April 26, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 6, 2016 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Signed by MDL Panel on 10/4/16. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
July 14, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Motions terminated: (56 in 5:16-cv-02267-BLF) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Terraform Global, Inc., Peter Blackmore, (44 in 5:16-cv-02269-BLF) STIPULATION W ITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Terraform Global, Inc., (41 in 5:16-cv-02272-BLF) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Terraform Global, Inc., (39 in 5:16-cv-02273-BLF) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Terraform Global, Inc., (40 in 5:16-cv-02270-BLF) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Terraform Global, Inc.. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2016)
June 7, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Motions terminated: (29 in 5:16-cv-02273-BLF) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Terraform Global, Inc., (36 in 5:16-cv-02269-BLF) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Terraf orm Global, Inc., (47 in 5:16-cv-02267-BLF) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Terraform Global, Inc., Peter Blackmore, (33 in 5:16-cv-02272-BLF) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Terraform Global, Inc., (32 in 5:16-cv-02270-BLF) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Terraform Global, Inc. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/7/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
May 10, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT TERRAFORM GLOBAL, INC.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/10/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
May 4, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/4/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System v. SunEdison, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System
Represented By: Jennifer N. Caringal
Represented By: David William Hall
Represented By: Dennis J. Herman
Represented By: James Ian Jaconette
Represented By: Darren Jay Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunEdison, Inc.
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terraform Global, Inc.
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Represented By: Brett Hammon
Represented By: Timothy J. Perla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahmad Chatila
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Wuebbels
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Domenech Zornoza
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Represented By: Katharine Ann Kates
Represented By: Kevin O'Connor
Represented By: Kevin J. O'Connor
Represented By: Ismail Jomo Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Truong
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Avenier
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Hernandez
Represented By: Daniel H. Bookin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emmanuel Hernandez
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio R. Alvarez
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Blackmore
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Represented By: Brett Hammon
Represented By: Timothy J. Perla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton Daley, Jr.
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georganne Proctor
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Tesoriere
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James B. Williams
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy H. Zwirn
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman, Sachs & Co.
Represented By: Patrick David Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: Patrick David Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc.
Represented By: Patrick David Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Represented By: Patrick David Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
Represented By: Patrick David Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Represented By: Patrick David Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Represented By: Patrick David Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BTG Pactual US Capital LLC
Represented By: Patrick David Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMBC Nikko Securities Americas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SG Americas Securities, LLC
Represented By: Patrick David Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kotak Mahindra, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Itau BBA USA Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick David Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?