Joelle Burgess et al v. County of Mendocino et al

Plaintiff: JOELLE BURGESS, VICTORIA LEE DALBEC, JASON JAY HAVRANEK and KARA MARZAN
Defendant: County of Mendocino, Thomas D. Allman, KAITLYN OLSON and California Forensic Medical Group Inc
Case Number: 3:2016cv02414
Filed: May 3, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Mendocino
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Referring Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 22, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Re 34 Stipulation filed by County of Mendocino, KAITLYN OLSON. Settlement Conference set for March 9, 2017 at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/22/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2016)
September 28, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 9/28/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2016)
August 8, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/08/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
May 20, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William H. Orrick. Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/20/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joelle Burgess et al v. County of Mendocino et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOELLE BURGESS
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Benjamin Nisenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICTORIA LEE DALBEC
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Benjamin Nisenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON JAY HAVRANEK
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Benjamin Nisenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KARA MARZAN
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Benjamin Nisenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Mendocino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas D. Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAITLYN OLSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Forensic Medical Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?