Gorup v. Riggio et al

Plaintiff: Brandon Gorup
Defendant: John Riggio, Lucky Stores, Inc., Lucky Stores, Inc. (FL) and United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 5
Case Number: 3:2016cv02419
Filed: May 4, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 13 MOTION TO REMAND.(denying 10 , 12 Motions to Dismiss). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2016)
May 23, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 18 EX PARTEAPPLICATION FOR ORDER TOSHOW CAUSE AND TEMPORARYRESTRAINING ORDER. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
May 20, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 19 Administrative Motion for: 1) Expedited Hearing and Consideration of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand this Action to State Court; or in the Alternative (2) to Stay the Briefing on Defendants' Pending Motions to Dismiss Until Motion to Remand has Been Decided. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
May 6, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/6/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gorup v. Riggio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Gorup
Represented By: Diane Aqui
Represented By: Antonio Luis Cortes
Represented By: Sherrill Ann Oates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Riggio
Represented By: Charles Trudrung Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucky Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Trudrung Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucky Stores, Inc. (FL)
Represented By: Charles Trudrung Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 5
Represented By: David Albert Rosenfeld
Represented By: Anne Iwa Yen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?