Time Warner Cable Inc. v. OpenTV,Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Time Warner Cable Inc.
Defendant: OpenTV, Inc., Nagravision SA and Kudelski SA
Case Number: 3:2016cv02433
Filed: May 4, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 28, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT by Hon. William Alsup denying 25 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
May 26, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JOSHUA L. COLLINS PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
May 24, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEYS MICHAEL BRODY AND JOSHUA L. COLLINS.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/24/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
May 18, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
May 17, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY JOSHUA L. COLLINS by Hon. William Alsup denying 13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Time Warner Cable Inc. v. OpenTV,Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Time Warner Cable Inc.
Represented By: David S. Bloch
Represented By: Michael Louis Brody
Represented By: Joshua Lee Collins
Represented By: Krishnan Padmanabhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OpenTV, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nagravision SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kudelski SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?