Kruger v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Dan Kruger
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 3:2016cv02459
Filed: May 5, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 for EAJA fee filed by Dan Kruger. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/13/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
December 7, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen (1) Granting 15 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; (2) Denying Defendant's 16 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; and (3) Remanding Case for Further Proceedings. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2016)
October 20, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for pl extension to respond to D cross motion for summary judgment filed by Dan Kruger. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/20/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2016)
May 9, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 12-cv- 5820-EMC. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/9/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kruger v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Kruger
Represented By: Richard Paul Zieman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Ben A. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?