New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC et al v. Picker et al

Plaintiff: New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC, Pacific Bell Telephone Company, California Cable & Telecommunications Association, Comcast Phone of California, LLC, Cox California Telcom, LLC, CTIA - The Wireless Association, Cellco Partnership and MCI Communications Services, Inc.
Defendant: Michael Picker, Mike Florio, Catherine J. K. Sandoval, Carla J. Peterman, Liane M. Randolph, Karl Bemesderfer and TURN - The Utility Reform Network
Case Number: 3:2016cv02461
Filed: May 5, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 12, 2017 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 1/12/2017. (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
August 19, 2016 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting 112 Motion for More Definite Statement. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
May 20, 2016 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria finding as moot 8 Motion for TRO; finding as moot 18 Motion for TRO; granting 18 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
May 16, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/16/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
May 13, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Susan Illston. Hon. Thelton E. Henderson no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/13/16. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 12, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/12/16. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
May 6, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Hon. Maxine M. Chesney no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/6/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC et al v. Picker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC
Represented By: Scott Harris Angstreich
Represented By: Christian Frederick Binnig
Represented By: Gregory Lee Castle
Represented By: Jay Tyson Covey
Represented By: David P. Discher
Represented By: Michael K. Kellogg
Represented By: Matthew Henry Marmolejo
Represented By: David Jeffrey Miller
Represented By: Isabelle Marie Salgado
Represented By: J. Covey Tyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Bell Telephone Company
Represented By: Scott Harris Angstreich
Represented By: Christian Frederick Binnig
Represented By: Gregory Lee Castle
Represented By: Jay Tyson Covey
Represented By: David P. Discher
Represented By: Michael K. Kellogg
Represented By: Matthew Henry Marmolejo
Represented By: David Jeffrey Miller
Represented By: Isabelle Marie Salgado
Represented By: J. Covey Tyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Cable & Telecommunications Association
Represented By: Lesla Jean Lehtonen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Comcast Phone of California, LLC
Represented By: Martin L. Fineman
Represented By: Peter Karanjia
Represented By: Suzanne Kathleen Toller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cox California Telcom, LLC
Represented By: Rees Ferriter Morgan
Represented By: Richard Ralph Patch
Represented By: Margaret L. Tobias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CTIA - The Wireless Association
Represented By: Michael B. Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cellco Partnership
Represented By: Thane Rehn
Represented By: Rudolph Munguia Reyes, Jr.
Represented By: Fred Anthony Rowley
Represented By: Henry Weissmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCI Communications Services, Inc.
Represented By: Thane Rehn
Represented By: Rudolph Munguia Reyes, Jr.
Represented By: Fred Anthony Rowley
Represented By: Henry Weissmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Picker
Represented By: Kimberly June Lippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Florio
Represented By: Kimberly June Lippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine J. K. Sandoval
Represented By: Kimberly June Lippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla J. Peterman
Represented By: Kimberly June Lippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liane M. Randolph
Represented By: Kimberly June Lippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl Bemesderfer
Represented By: Kimberly June Lippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TURN - The Utility Reform Network
Represented By: Christine Ann Mailloux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?