GeoVector Corporation v. Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. et al

Plaintiff: Geovector Corporation
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC., Samsung International, Inc. and Samsung Research America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv02463
Filed: May 5, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 17, 2017 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/17/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
February 14, 2017 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 49 MOTION TO DISMISS PARTS OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Hon. William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2017)
January 9, 2017 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 45 MOTION TO STRIKE, STAYING DISCOVERY, AND GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND by Hon. William H. Orrick. Tutorial Hearing set for 6/16/2017 10:00 AM and Markman hearing set for 6/23/2017 10:00 AM.,both in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2017)
November 10, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 14 MOTION TO DISMISS IN PART by Hon. William H. Orrick. Samsung's motion to dismiss the misappropriation, Lanham Act, RICO and declaratory relief claims, as well as defendant STA, is GRANTED. GeoVector will have 20 days leave to amend. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
September 16, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME as to 14 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Response due by 9/23/2016. Reply due by 10/7/2016. (Hearing remains set for 10/19/2016.) Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/16/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
June 13, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AS MODIFIED GRANTING STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT 9 . Case Management Statement due by 9/14/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/13/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GeoVector Corporation v. Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geovector Corporation
Represented By: Jack Russo
Represented By: Christopher Sargent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Research America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?