Krawczyk v. Directory Distributing Associates, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: James Krawczyk
Defendant: Directory Distributing Associates, Inc. and AT&T Corp.
Case Number: 3:2016cv02531
Filed: May 10, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 15, 2017 159 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria denying without prejudice 144 Motion to Transfer Case. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2017)
December 23, 2016 131 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 129 Stipulation Establishing Pleading Deadlines Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-1(a) filed by AT&T Advertising, LP, AT&T Services, Inc., YP Shared Services, LP, AT&T Inc., YP Holdings, LLC, AT&T Corp. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 12/23/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2016)
December 9, 2016 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on 64 , 80 , 82 , 84 , 86 , 88 MOTIONS to Dismiss and Strike. Any amended complaint is due by 12/23/2016. The plaintiffs have until 2/8/2017 to complete jurisdictional discovery re AT&T Inc. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 12/9/2016. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krawczyk v. Directory Distributing Associates, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Krawczyk
Represented By: Cynthia Jane Diggs
Represented By: Janie Lynn Jordan
Represented By: Richard Warren Mithoff
Represented By: Mark Cotton Molumphy
Represented By: Russell Post
Represented By: Judith Sadler
Represented By: Rachel Adel Smith
Represented By: Alexandra P Summer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Directory Distributing Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?