Creative Mobile Technologies, LLC v. Flywheel Software, Inc.

Plaintiff: Creative Mobile Technologies, LLC
Defendant: Flywheel Software, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv02560
Filed: May 11, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 21, 2017 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM 52 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/21/2017)
January 17, 2017 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: FIRST DISCOVERY DISPUTE 53 54 56 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
December 6, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF/COUNTER-DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM 42 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/6/2016)
October 5, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF/COUNTER-DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIMS 29 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
May 19, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Magistrate Sallie Kim granting in part and denying in part 4 Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (sklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Creative Mobile Technologies, LLC v. Flywheel Software, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Creative Mobile Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Kathryn Kelly Erno
Represented By: Benjamin Laban Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flywheel Software, Inc.
Represented By: Brian R. Blackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?