Almgren et al v. Shultz et al

Plaintiff: Jon Almgren and Melissa Almgren
Defendant: William Shultz, Katherine Shultz, Contra Costa County, Contra Costa Health Services, Contra Costa County Office of the Sheriff and Miguel Aguilera
Case Number: 3:2016cv02611
Filed: May 13, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying 33 Motion for Default Judgment. Plaintiffs state law claims against Defendant William Shultz are dismissed without prejudice to re-filing in state court. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
August 2, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE COURT'S JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT KATHERINE SHULTZ (Certificate of Service attached) Plaintiffs' Response due by 8/9/16, Defendant's Response due by 8/16/16, Plaintiffs' Reply due by 8/19/16 Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/2/16. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016) Modified on 8/2/2016 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
July 18, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/18/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Almgren et al v. Shultz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Almgren
Represented By: Lawrence Darryl Goldberg
Represented By: William T. Nagle
Represented By: Michael Patrick Verna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Almgren
Represented By: Lawrence Darryl Goldberg
Represented By: William T. Nagle
Represented By: Michael Patrick Verna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Shultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Shultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa County
Represented By: Patrick L. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa County Office of the Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel Aguilera
Represented By: Patrick L. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?