Bennett Goldberg et al v. Stephens Institute

Plaintiff: Bennett Goldberg and Linda Kuckuk
Defendant: Stephens Institute
Case Number: 3:2016cv02613
Filed: May 13, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 28, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PARTIES' STIPULATION AND PLAINTIFFS' SUBMISSION RE MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/28/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
June 9, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 STIPULATION to Reschedule Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/12/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/9/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
May 26, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/5/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/12/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/26/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
May 25, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/25/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett Goldberg et al v. Stephens Institute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bennett Goldberg
Represented By: William McGrane
Represented By: Matthew Jeffrey Shier
Represented By: Linda Louise Sorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Kuckuk
Represented By: William McGrane
Represented By: Matthew Jeffrey Shier
Represented By: Linda Louise Sorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephens Institute
Represented By: James J. Brosnahan
Represented By: George C. Harris
Represented By: Lucia X. Roibal
Represented By: Claudia Maria Vetesi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?