Google Inc. v. Creative Labs, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Google Inc.
Defendant: Creative Labs, Inc. and Creative Technology Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2016cv02628
Filed: May 16, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 23, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 41 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Reflect Name Change from Google Inc. to Google LLC filed by Google LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 23, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
November 28, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STAY by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 16 Motion to Stay. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
October 11, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting Modification of Hearing Date and Briefing Schedule filed by Creative Labs, Inc., Creative Technology Ltd. Case Management Statement due by 11/29/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/1/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 11, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
September 21, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Enlarge Time For Briefing and Move Hearing on Creative's Motions To Dismiss, Creative's Motion to Stay, and Case Management Conference to New Date filed by Google Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 21, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2016)
June 29, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 13 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Requesting Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint and Rescheduling the Case Management Conference Pursuant to L.R. 6-2 filed by Google Inc. Case Management Statement due by 9/21/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/28/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 29, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Google Inc. v. Creative Labs, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Google Inc.
Represented By: Bijal Vijay Vakil
Represented By: Allen W. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creative Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creative Technology Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?