Aaron Brewer et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Aaron Brewer and Della Chambers Brewer
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and The Bank of New York Mellon
Case Number: 3:2016cv02664
Filed: May 17, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 6, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING DEFENDANTS 8 MOTION TO DISMISS. Amended Pleadings due by 5/12/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
December 29, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 22 Stipulation selecting Mediation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2016)
May 31, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Unusable Chambers Copies of Wells Fargo's 9 Request for Judicial Notice filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Wells Fargo shall submit a usable copy by 6/6/2016. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/31/2016. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aaron Brewer et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Brewer
Represented By: Brady Larsen
Represented By: Michael James Yesk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Della Chambers Brewer
Represented By: Brady Larsen
Represented By: Michael James Yesk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Daniel A Armstrong
Represented By: Robert Arthur Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?