Escobar v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. et al

Plaintiff: Manuel Escobar
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, GreenPoint Mortgage Funding, Inc., Western Progressive LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and HSBC BANK, USA, National Association
Case Number: 3:2016cv02728
Filed: May 19, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Dismissing Case with Prejudice. The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 08/26/2016. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2016)
July 25, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Judge Lucy Koh Granting 5 Motion to Dismiss. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016)
June 10, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT TO A DISTRICT JUDGE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/10/2016. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Escobar v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Escobar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Gurinder Singh Grewal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GreenPoint Mortgage Funding, Inc.
Represented By: Gurinder Singh Grewal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Progressive LLC
Represented By: Gurinder Singh Grewal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Gurinder Singh Grewal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC BANK, USA, National Association
Represented By: Gurinder Singh Grewal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?