Huawei Technologies, Co, Ltd et al v. Samsung Electronics Co, Ltd. et al

Plaintiff: Huawei Technologies, Co, Ltd, Huawei Device USA Inc. and Huawei Technologies USA, Inc
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co, Ltd., Samsung Electronics America Inc and Samsung Research America
Case Number: 3:2016cv02787
Filed: May 24, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 24, 2017 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 157 STIPULATION Requesting Reschedule of Claim Construction Hearing. Claims Construction Hearing rescheduled for 8/18/2017 08:30 AM. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/24/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
May 10, 2017 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO RESCHEDULE TECHNOLOGY TUTORIAL AND CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING granting 137 STIPULATION. Tutorial Hearing set for 8/7/2017 09:00 AM and Claims Construction Hearing set for 8/10/2017 09:00 AM, both in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/10/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2017)
April 27, 2017 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING SAMSUNG LEAVE TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 116 Motion to Amend. The parties are directed to file joint or competing proposals by Wednesday, May 3, 2017, suggesting strategies that will allow this case to proceed on a manageable scale. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2017)
January 26, 2017 112 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CLAIM CONSTRUCTION DATES re 111 Stipulation. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/26/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2017)
November 21, 2016 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge William H. Orrick denying 39 Motion to Dismiss; granting 3 , 41 , 90 , 97 , 100 and 102 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
September 20, 2016 83 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED REQUEST AND ORDER TO RESCHEDULE HEARING ON SAMSUNG'S PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS AND EXTEND BRIEFING DEADLINES as to 39 MOTION to Dismiss. Response due by 9/27/2016. Reply due by 10/11/2016. Motion Hearing set for 10/26/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/20/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2016)
August 31, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Stipulation to Reset Deadlines as to 39 MOTION to Dismiss.Responses due by 9/20/2016. Replies due by 10/4/2016. Motion Hearing set for 10/19/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/31/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2016)
August 4, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 9/6/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/04/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
May 26, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William H. Orrick. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/26/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huawei Technologies, Co, Ltd et al v. Samsung Electronics Co, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huawei Technologies, Co, Ltd
Represented By: Michael J. Bettinger
Represented By: David Giardina
Represented By: Nathan Greenblatt
Represented By: Douglas I. Lewis
Represented By: John Weatherby McBride
Represented By: David T. Pritikin
Represented By: Raquel Catalina Rodriguez
Represented By: Irene Inkyu Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huawei Device USA Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Bettinger
Represented By: David Giardina
Represented By: Nathan Greenblatt
Represented By: Douglas I. Lewis
Represented By: John Weatherby McBride
Represented By: David T. Pritikin
Represented By: Raquel Catalina Rodriguez
Represented By: Irene Inkyu Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huawei Technologies USA, Inc
Represented By: Michael J. Bettinger
Represented By: David Giardina
Represented By: Nathan Greenblatt
Represented By: Douglas I. Lewis
Represented By: John Weatherby McBride
Represented By: David T. Pritikin
Represented By: Raquel Catalina Rodriguez
Represented By: Irene Inkyu Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co, Ltd.
Represented By: Marissa R. Ducca
Represented By: Kevin P.B. Johnson
Represented By: Victoria F. Maroulis
Represented By: David Andrew Perlson
Represented By: Charles Kramer Verhoeven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America Inc
Represented By: Kevin P.B. Johnson
Represented By: Victoria F. Maroulis
Represented By: David Andrew Perlson
Represented By: Charles Kramer Verhoeven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Research America
Represented By: Kevin P.B. Johnson
Represented By: Victoria F. Maroulis
Represented By: David Andrew Perlson
Represented By: Charles Kramer Verhoeven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?