Jacinto v. Ditech Financial LLC et al

Plaintiff: Modesta Jacinto
Defendant: Ditech Financial LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and National Default Servicing Corporation
Case Number: 3:2016cv02815
Filed: May 25, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 3, 2017 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS DITECH AND MERS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS; VACATING HEARING; DISMISSING ACTION. The hearing scheduled for January 6, 2017, is vacated. The Second Amended Complaint is dismissed without further leave to amend and the above-titled action is dismissed. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 1/3/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
December 22, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/22/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2016)
November 28, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/28/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
October 26, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS DITECH AND MERS' MOTION TO DISMISS; AFFORDING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO AMEND; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Should plaintiff wish to file a second amended complaint, plaintiff shall file it no later than November 14, 2016. The case management conference is continued to February 10, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/26/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2016)
September 16, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. The Court deems the matter appropriate for determination on the parties' respective submissions, and hereby vacates the hearing scheduled for September 23, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 09/16/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
August 29, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; RESETTING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The hearing on defendants' motion to dismiss is reset for Friday, September 23, 2016, at 9:00 a.m. The Case Management Conference is reset for Friday, November 4, 2016, at 10:30 a.m. An updated Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than October 28, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 29, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2016)
August 24, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; VACATING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS. The hearing on defendants' Motion to Dismiss is vacated, and plaintiff is Ordered to Show Cause, in writing and no later than September 7, 2016, why the opposition should not be stricken. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 24, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2016)
July 19, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF CHANGE IN COUNSEL; ORDER THEREON. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 19, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016)
July 18, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANT'S MOTION OT DISMISS; VACATING HEARING. The Court denies as moot defendant's motion to dismiss the initial complain, and vacates the July 29, 2016 hearing scheduled thereon. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 18, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
June 16, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO PROVIDE CHAMBERS COPIES OF DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 16, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
May 31, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/31/2016. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacinto v. Ditech Financial LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Modesta Jacinto
Represented By: Patricia Renee Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Financial LLC
Represented By: Thomas Nathaniel Abbott
Represented By: Laszlo Ladi, Jr
Represented By: Mary Kate Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Nathaniel Abbott
Represented By: Laszlo Ladi, Jr
Represented By: Mary Kate Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Default Servicing Corporation
Represented By: Theron Spencer Covey, III
Represented By: William Francis McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?