Smith v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Myrica Smith
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv02832
Filed: May 25, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 12, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PRETRIAL PREPARATION, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Mandatory Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/28/2016. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2016)
August 8, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 16 Proposed Order filed by Myrica Smith. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 8/8/2016. *Counsel are directed to contact the court clerk for dial-in instructions.*(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
June 6, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASES Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/17/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/24/2016 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 6/6/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2016) Modified on 6/6/2016 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myrica Smith
Represented By: John Paul Briscoe
Represented By: William Joseph Gorham, III
Represented By: Nicholas John Scardigli
Represented By: Robert J Wasserman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Christoper Gonzalez
Represented By: Caleb H Liang
Represented By: Lacey E. Rainwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Christoper Gonzalez
Represented By: Caleb H Liang
Represented By: Lacey E. Rainwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?