Wycinsky v. City of Richmond et al

Plaintiff: Jonathan Wycinsky
Defendant: City of Richmond and Christopher Magnus
Case Number: 3:2016cv02873
Filed: May 27, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 09/18/2017. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2017)
August 8, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 08/08/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2017)
October 3, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of City of Richmond, Christopher Magnus against Jonathan Wycinsky. To the extent that the above-titled action is brought against the City, the action is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice, pursuant to Rule12(b)(6).Plaintiffs claims against Magnus are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice, pursuant to Rule 4(m). (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
September 30, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING ACTION. Plaintiff's claims against defendant City of Richmond are dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff's claims against defendant Christopher Magnus a re dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the file and enter judgment in favor of the defendants. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 09/30/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
September 14, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT MAGNUS SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED. Plaintiff is hereby ordered to show cause, in writing and no later than September 28, 2016, why plaintiff's claims against Christopher Magnus should not be dismissed. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 09/14/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
August 2, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S RECOMMENDATION; GRANTING DEFENDANT CITY OF RICHMOND'S MOTION TO DISMISS; AFFORDING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO AMEND. The Court, for the reasons stated in its order of dismissal, filed July 19, 2016, in Case No. 16-2871, grants the City of Richmond's motion to dismiss and adopts Judge Kim's recommendation with respect to said defendant. In light thereof, the hearing scheduled for September 2, 2016, is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 2, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
July 28, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES OF DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 28, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
June 23, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 6/30/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 6/23/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wycinsky v. City of Richmond et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Richmond
Represented By: Madelyn G. Jordan-Davis
Represented By: C. Christine Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Magnus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Wycinsky
Represented By: Peter Henry Bonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?