Razzari v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Arlene Marilyn Razzari
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 3:2016cv02945
Filed: June 1, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Response due by 4/28/2017. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on April 11, 2017. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
July 13, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Hon. Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/13/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2016)
June 30, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERRAL to a Randomly Assigned Magistrate Judge for All Purposes. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/29/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
June 3, 2016 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE CONSENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/2/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Razzari v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlene Marilyn Razzari
Represented By: Monica Perales
Represented By: Steven Gilberto Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Ben A. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?