Petrolino, et al v. City and County San Francisco, et al

Plaintiff: Fabio Petrolino, Andrelina Silva, Angela Petrolino, Alex Petrolino, M.P. and Ana Petrolino
Defendant: City and County San Francisco, Eve Zeff, Roel L. Lapitan, Raphroger Gonzaga, Michael Mohn, Rudy Zamora, HealthRIGHT 360, Lauren Erickson, Mary Lefevre, Nick Crispino and Daniel Mitchell
Case Number: 3:2016cv02946
Filed: June 2, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2017 96 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/14/2017 at 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 12/7/2017. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/18/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2017)
October 6, 2017 91 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 90 To Continue The Trial Date And Amend Case Management Scheduling Order. Jury Selection previously set for 2/26/18 continued to 3/19/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Richard Seeborg. Jury Trial previously set for 2/26/18 continued to 3/19/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/6/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
February 2, 2017 71 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 69 FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/2/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2017)
January 6, 2017 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 58 Defendant Mitchell's Second Motion to Dismiss. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
October 24, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting in part and denying in part 30 Officer Mitchell's Motion to Dismiss. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
September 1, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time to File Response and Reply Briefs and to Continue Hearing on Defendant Mitchell's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/1/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petrolino, et al v. City and County San Francisco, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fabio Petrolino
Represented By: Benjamin Joseph Bien-Kahn
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Bornstein
Represented By: Ernest James Galvan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrelina Silva
Represented By: Benjamin Joseph Bien-Kahn
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Bornstein
Represented By: Ernest James Galvan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Petrolino
Represented By: Benjamin Joseph Bien-Kahn
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Bornstein
Represented By: Ernest James Galvan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Petrolino
Represented By: Benjamin Joseph Bien-Kahn
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Bornstein
Represented By: Ernest James Galvan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.P.
Represented By: Benjamin Joseph Bien-Kahn
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Bornstein
Represented By: Ernest James Galvan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Petrolino
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Bornstein
Represented By: Ernest James Galvan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eve Zeff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roel L. Lapitan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raphroger Gonzaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Mohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rudy Zamora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HealthRIGHT 360
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Lefevre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Crispino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?