DeVries v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Plaintiff: Sean Gilbert DeVries
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv02953
Filed: June 2, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 1, 2017 63 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 61 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
February 24, 2017 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 31 MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND 33 MOTION TO STAY by Judge William H. Orrick. Status Report due by 8/24/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2017)
October 11, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Stipulation. Reset Deadlines as to 31 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and 33 MOTION to Stay. Responses due by 10/14/2016. Replies due by 10/28/2016. Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/11/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
October 4, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND BRIEFING DEADLINES as to 31 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and 33 MOTION to Stay. Responses due by 10/11/2016. Replies due by 10/18/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/04/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2016)
August 9, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER - Case Management Conference continued to 10/4/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 9/27/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/09/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeVries v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Gilbert DeVries
Represented By: Michael Robert Reese
Represented By: Melissa Weiner Wolchansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?