Grouse River Outfitters Ltd v. NetSuite, Inc.

Plaintiff: Grouse River Outfitters Ltd
Defendant: NetSuite, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv02954
Filed: June 2, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 6, 2017 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler entered order on 62 Discovery Letter Brief. The plaintiff need not answer the disputed interrogatories at this time. See attached order for full discussion. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
October 12, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion to Dismiss. The court dismisses the fraud claims with leave to amend. The court dismisses the Penal Code s496 claim with prejudice. The court otherwise denies the motion to dismiss. See the attached order for details. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2016)
July 1, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 17 REGARDING INVOICE PAYMENTS filed by Grouse River Outfitters Ltd. Motions terminated: 10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to restrain defendant NetSuite from terminating plaintiff Grouse River's software system filed by Grouse River Outfitters Ltd. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/1/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grouse River Outfitters Ltd v. NetSuite, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grouse River Outfitters Ltd
Represented By: Loren Kieve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NetSuite, Inc.
Represented By: Scott D. Gattey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?