Software Research, Inc. v. Dotcom-Monitor, Inc.

Plaintiff: Software Research, Inc.
Defendant: Dotcom-Monitor, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv02970
Filed: June 2, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 3, 2017 46 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 45 Stipulation filed by Software Research, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/3/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
October 17, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 38 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Software Research, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/17/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
September 8, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON 23 MOTION TO DISMISS: Initial Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing are reset for 10/6/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 9/29/2016. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/8/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Software Research, Inc. v. Dotcom-Monitor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Software Research, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Laban Singer
Represented By: Douglas Stephen Tilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dotcom-Monitor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?