Musa v. Continental Casualty

Plaintiff: Michael Musa
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2016cv03006
Filed: June 3, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 30, 2017 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 76 Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 6/29/2017. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
September 20, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER: Re 21 Proposed Order filed by Continental Casualty Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 9/20/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2016)
August 26, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler Granting 15 Stipulation Selecting Private ADR. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Musa v. Continental Casualty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Musa
Represented By: Charles Michael Louderback
Represented By: John Fitzpatrick Vannucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company
Represented By: Richard Burk Lapp
Represented By: Camille Annette Olson
Represented By: Daniel Joshua Salinas
Represented By: Andrew Russell Verriere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?