The American Insurance Company v. R&Q Reinsurance Company

Plaintiff: The American Insurance Company
Defendant: R&Q Reinsurance Company
Case Number: 3:2016cv03044
Filed: June 6, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 22, 2017 50 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 49 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Defendant R&Q Reinsurance Company with Prejudice and Without Costs filed by The American Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 22, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2017)
November 30, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 42 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re 39 MOTION to Dismiss The American Insurance Company's Amended Complaint and Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities Stipulation to Continue the Briefing Schedule filed by The American Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 30, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2016)
October 12, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 16 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2016)
September 20, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 29 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by The American Insurance Company filed by The American Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 20, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2016)
July 26, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 24 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR R&Q TO FILE ITS REPLY INSUPPORT OF ITS RULE 12(b)(2) MOTION TO DISMISS, filed by R&Q Reinsurance Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 26, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The American Insurance Company v. R&Q Reinsurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The American Insurance Company
Represented By: Kelly Denise Fair
Represented By: Shawn L. Kelly
Represented By: John R. Vales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R&Q Reinsurance Company
Represented By: Timothy Colin Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?