Dunson et al v. Cordis Corporation
Plaintiff: Jerry Dunson, Cheryl Grech, Robert Flanagan, Carol Flanagan and Joseph Gieber
Defendant: Cordis Corporation and Confluent Medical Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv03076
Filed: June 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re C-17-1725-PJH. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/7/17. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2017)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re: Case No. 17-cv-00023-TEH. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/18/17. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 4:17-cv-00022 PJH. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 01/09/2017. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2017)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases 16-cv-6049-VC and 16-cv-3076-EMC. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 12/22/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2016)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 74 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER via Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney filed by Confluent Medical Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/22/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying Defendant's Motion to Stay. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2016)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re No. 4:16-cv-5934 PJH. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/19/2016. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2016)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases: 16-cv-05455-SBA Hauck, et al v. Cordis Corp., et al with 16-cv-03076-EMC Dunson, et al v. Cordis Corporation, et al. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 10/3/16. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXPEDITE THE BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE RE: MOTION to Stay re (53) Order Remand Order Pending Appeal; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof. Responses due by 10/4/2016. Replies due by 10/11/2016. Motion Hearing reset for 10/27/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/30/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Remanding Cases to State Court. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/23/2016. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2016)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 16-cv-4608-VC. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/19/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER resetting Hearing re: CAFA Jurisdiction from 9/1/2016 to 9/8/2016 01:15 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/18/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2016)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re: Case No. 16-cv-04409-TEH. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/10/16. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2016)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Judge Susan Illston no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/8/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE: CAFA JURISDICTION (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/27/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CAFA JURISDICTION (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING IN PART CORDIS CORPORATION'S MOTION TO DISMISS - AMENDED (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ON AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/8/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunson et al v. Cordis Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Dunson
Represented By: Troy Alexander Brenes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Grech
Represented By: Troy Alexander Brenes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Flanagan
Represented By: Troy Alexander Brenes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Flanagan
Represented By: Troy Alexander Brenes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Gieber
Represented By: Troy Alexander Brenes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cordis Corporation
Represented By: Kevin Cooper Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Confluent Medical Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle A Childers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?