Herbert et al v. Cordis Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Walter Herbert, Russell Anderson, Martha Graham, Frank Graham, Tamarra Grayson, Timothy Howard, Ted Michael Martinez, Cynthia Martinez, Judy Shaffer, John Shaffer, Jr., Clarice Stepp and Allison Fisher
Defendant: Cordis Corporation, Johnson & Johnson, Cardinal Health, Inc. and Confluent Medical Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv03085
Filed: June 6, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases to 16-cv-3076-SI. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/27/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
July 19, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING re 14 MOTION to Remand filed by Cynthia Martinez, Russell Anderson, John Shaffer, Jr., Ted Michael Martinez, Timothy Howard, Allison Fisher, Judy Shaffer, Walter Herbert, Clarice Stepp, Martha Graham, Tamarra Grayson, Frank Graham. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 19, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016)
July 5, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 16 Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant Cordis Corporation to File Reply In Support Of Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Strike filed by Cordis Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 5, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herbert et al v. Cordis Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Herbert
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Anderson
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Graham
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Graham
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamarra Grayson
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Howard
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ted Michael Martinez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Martinez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Shaffer
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Shaffer, Jr.
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarice Stepp
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Fisher
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cordis Corporation
Represented By: Kevin Cooper Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Confluent Medical Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?