Oehring et al v. Cordis Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Oehring, Luther Leatham, Sonji Hutchinson, Sandra Sutter, Lynda Smith, Alan Goldberg, Benito Brown, Lupe Brown, Patricia Bunker, Carmen Burgess, Travis Burkhart, Kimberly Burkhart, Philip Faciana, Louise Hill, Keith Hunter, Ellen Juvera-Saiz, Brandi Kirk, Lisa Kumbier, Jessica Larimore, Herman Malone, Dorothy May, Dustin Merritt, Cindy Seymore, Freddie Wilson, Donald Holland, James McCord, Billy Richard, Melanie Richard, John Rogers, Sean Maguire, Laura Maguire, Gilda Southerland, Vincent Southerland, Chad Southerland and Duke Southerland
Defendant: Cordis Corporation, Johnson & Johnson and Cardinal Health, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv03088
Filed: June 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases to 16-cv-3076-SI. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/27/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING 40 STIPULATION POSTPONE/CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/21/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' SUMMARIES OF ARGUMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/8/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2016)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING, IN PART, AND DENYING, IN PART, 21 Motion to Stay.Oppositions to 7 Motion to Dismiss and 13 Motion to Dismiss due by 7/8/2016 and Replies due by 7/20/2016. Motion Hearing on 7 , 13 , and 20 set for 8/5/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 29, 2016. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2016)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REGARDING CORRECTED DOCUMENTS AND INSTRUCTIONS TO THE PARTIES. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/28/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/2/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/9/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/15/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oehring et al v. Cordis Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Oehring
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luther Leatham
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonji Hutchinson
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Sutter
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynda Smith
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Goldberg
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benito Brown
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lupe Brown
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Bunker
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Burgess
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Burkhart
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Burkhart
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Faciana
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louise Hill
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Hunter
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Juvera-Saiz
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi Kirk
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Kumbier
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Larimore
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman Malone
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy May
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Merritt
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Seymore
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddie Wilson
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Holland
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James McCord
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Richard
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Richard
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Rogers
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Maguire
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Maguire
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilda Southerland
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Southerland
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Southerland
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duke Southerland
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cordis Corporation
Represented By: Kevin Cooper Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Sarah E. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Cooper Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?