Vaughn E Crawford v. City of Union City et al

Plaintiff: Vaughn E Crawford
Defendant: City of Union City, Union City Police Department, Darryl C McAllister, Andrew Gannam, Michael Bedford and Daniel Rivas-Villegas
Case Number: 3:2016cv03094
Filed: June 7, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 3, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF ENTIRE ACTION re 34 Stipulation filed by Vaughn E Crawford. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 4/3/2017. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
December 14, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that said action be dismissed without prejudice; provided, however, that if any party hereto shall certify to this Court, within ninety days, with proof of service of a copy thereon on opposing counsel, tha t the agreed consideration for the settlement has not been delivered, the foregoing Order shall stand vacated and this action shall forthwith be restored to the calendar to be set for trial.. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/14/16. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2016)
September 12, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PRETRIAL PREPARATION. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 9/12/2016. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vaughn E Crawford v. City of Union City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vaughn E Crawford
Represented By: Michael Robert Bracamontes
Represented By: Shaun Anderson Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Union City
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union City Police Department
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl C McAllister
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Gannam
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Bedford
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Rivas-Villegas
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?