S & P Financial Advisors et al v. Kreeyaa LLC et al

Plaintiff: S & P Financial Advisors and Mansoor Rahmani
Defendant: Kreeyaa LLC, Mangootha Kauravlla and Shashi Kauravlla
Case Number: 3:2016cv03103
Filed: June 7, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/31/2016 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 8/26/2016. (sklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2016)
August 18, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 8/25/2016. The hearing re: 19 Motion for Sanctions set for September 7, 2016 is VACATED, and may be reset by further Order from this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 8/18/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2016)
August 15, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 8/19/2016. The hearing set for August 24, 2016 is VACATED, and may be reset by further Order from this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 8/15/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2016)
August 1, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' CONSENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 8/1/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S & P Financial Advisors et al v. Kreeyaa LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kreeyaa LLC
Represented By: Adam Pennella
Represented By: James R. Stevens
Represented By: John Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mangootha Kauravlla
Represented By: Adam Pennella
Represented By: James R. Stevens
Represented By: John Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shashi Kauravlla
Represented By: Adam Pennella
Represented By: James R. Stevens
Represented By: John Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S & P Financial Advisors
Represented By: Albert Loeb Boasberg
Represented By: Angela Danielle Lipsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mansoor Rahmani
Represented By: Albert Loeb Boasberg
Represented By: Angela Danielle Lipsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?