X/Open Company, Ltd. v. Xinuos, Inc.

Plaintiff: X/Open Company, Ltd.
Defendant: Xinuos, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv03122
Filed: June 8, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 1, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/1/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
April 26, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Vacate and Reset Hearing and for an Extension of Time to Finalize Settlement Agreement and Dismissal. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/26/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
March 1, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/27/2017 at 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 4/20/2017. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/1/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
October 21, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER for Extension of Time for Mediation. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/21/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: X/Open Company, Ltd. v. Xinuos, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: X/Open Company, Ltd.
Represented By: Naresh Kilaru
Represented By: Morgan Elizabeth Smith
Represented By: Mark Sommers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xinuos, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?