Todd Johnston v. Uber Technologies, Inc.

Plaintiff: Todd Johnston
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv03134
Filed: June 9, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2017 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Staying Proceedings. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/22/2017. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2017)
April 3, 2017 65 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 64 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Briefing Schedule in Johnston v. Uber Technologies, Inc. (Case No. 3:16-cv-3134-EMC) filed by Todd Johnston. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/3/17. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
August 29, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER. Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2016. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 11/17/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/29/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Todd Johnston v. Uber Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Johnston
Represented By: Thomas J. Brandi
Represented By: John Randolph Davis
Represented By: Brian J. Malloy
Represented By: Michael L Slack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Carlos Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?