Henry Schein, Inc. v. Cook

Plaintiff: Henry Schein, Inc.
Defendant: Jennifer Cook
Case Number: 3:2016cv03166
Filed: June 9, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 1, 2017 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT JENNIFER COOKS MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 49 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
August 8, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR FILING OF DISCOVERY PLAN re 33 Letter filed by Henry Schein, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 8, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
July 21, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 21, 2016. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
July 20, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE re 26 Letter filed by Henry Schein, Inc. Plaintiff is ordered to serve a copy of this order on Patterson forthwith. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 20, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
June 29, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE EXPEDITED DISCOVERY re 21 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Re: Joint Expedited Discovery Plan filed by Henry Schein, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 29, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2016)
June 22, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ; Motion for Expedited Discovery; and Preliminary Injunction filed by Henry Schein, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 22, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2016)
June 10, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND DENYING REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 2 Motion for TRO. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry Schein, Inc. v. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Schein, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey G. Knowles
Represented By: Rees Ferriter Morgan
Represented By: Andrew Philip Schalkwyk
Represented By: Abraham Y. Skoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Cook
Represented By: Samantha D. Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?