Liu v. Allscripts, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Eileen Liu
Defendant: Allscripts, Inc., Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc., Allscripts Healthcare, LLC, Steven Holmquist and Loraine Uebele
Case Number: 3:2016cv03242
Filed: June 13, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2017 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/29/2017 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 6/26/2017. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/20/2017. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
March 30, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Dismissing Defendants Steven Holmquist and Loraine Uebele. Defendants Steven Holmquist and Loraine Uebele dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 3/30/2017. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2017) Modified on 3/30/2017 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS, Case referred to early neutral evaluation. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 9/14/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liu v. Allscripts, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Liu
Represented By: Stephen Michael Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allscripts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allscripts Healthcare, LLC
Represented By: Ross David Eberly
Represented By: Margaret Anne Keane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Holmquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loraine Uebele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?