Barnes v. Monument Security, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: N'Kayla Barnes
Defendant: Monument Security, Inc. and Jetro Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv03281
Filed: June 14, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANT RD/JET, LLC'S MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT; DIRECTIONS TO RD/JET, LLC. The August 11, 2017 hearing on RD/JET LLC's Motion to Determine Good Faith of Settlement is vacated. If RD/JE T, LLC wishes to proceed with the motion, it is directed to file and serve on all parties, no later than August 2, 2017, one or more supplemental declarations, setting forth the amount of the settlement and an explanation as to why it is adequate. I n the event such supplemental materials are filed, Monument may file, no later than August 9, 2017, a response thereto, and, unless the parties are otherwise advised, the motion will stand submitted as of that date. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 07/26/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2017)
June 21, 2017 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONDITIONALLY CLOSING CASE FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 06/21/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2017)
April 24, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING MEDIATION COMPLETION DEADLINE. The parties are directed to contact their assigned mediator to schedule their mediation, the completion deadline for which is extended to June 30, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/24/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017)
April 7, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE STATUS REPORT. The parties are directed to file, no later than April 21, 2017, a joint report apprising the Court as to the status of the case, including how the parties wish to proceed as to defendant RD/JET LLC, erroneously sued as Jetro Holdings, LLC, as to which no stay has been entered. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/07/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2017)
January 23, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/23/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017)
November 22, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING; GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL; EXTENDING MEDIATION DEADLINE; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. Spinelli, Donald & Nott's motion to withdraw as counsel for defendant Monument Security, Inc. is gr anted. Monument shall file a substitution of counsel no later than January 27, 2017. If Monument fails to do so, plaintiff may seek entry of default and default judgment. The deadline by which the parties shall complete mediation is extended to March 15, 2017. The clerk shall serve a copy of this order by mail on Monument. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/22/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
October 24, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT MONUMENT SECURITY TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION TO WITHDRAW. Spinelli, Donald & Nott is directed to file, no later than October 28, 2016, proof of service of the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Reco rd on Monument. If a copy of such motion was mailed to Monument on the date it was filed, any opposition must be filed no later than November 7, 2016. If the motion was mailed on a different date, any opposition must be filed no later than 17 days from the date of such mailing. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/24/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
September 21, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 9/21/16. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2016)
September 9, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR PARTIES TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FOR INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 09/09/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2016)
July 28, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 28, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes v. Monument Security, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N'Kayla Barnes
Represented By: Jocelyn Burton
Represented By: Scott S Nakama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monument Security, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jetro Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?