Scott v. Bayer Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Norma Scott
Defendant: Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer Essure Inc. and Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv03369
Filed: June 16, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 20, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY KIMBERLY A. DOUGHERTY PRO HAC VICE disregard 35 . Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/20/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016) Modified on 7/20/2016 (dl, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY KIMBERLY A. DOUGHERTY by Hon. William Alsup denying 31 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016)
July 13, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ROBERT K. JENNER PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 28 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2016)
July 11, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re (26 in 3:16-cv-03369-WHA) Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2016)
July 8, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER ON BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO REMAND by Hon. William Alsup granting 23 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2016)
June 30, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/30/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Bayer Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Scott
Represented By: Kimberly A Dougherty
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Graham
Represented By: Hilary Hochman
Represented By: Robert Keith Jenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Corporation
Represented By: Alycia Ann Degen
Represented By: Bradley Dugan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer HealthCare LLC
Represented By: Alycia Ann Degen
Represented By: Bradley Dugan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Essure Inc.
Represented By: Alycia Ann Degen
Represented By: Bradley Dugan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Alycia Ann Degen
Represented By: Bradley Dugan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?