Hughes v. S.A.W. Entertainment, LTD

Plaintiff: Nicole Hughes
Defendant: S.A.W. Entertainment, LTD
Case Number: 3:2016cv03371
Filed: June 16, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:5
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 20, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE ORDER AT ECF NO. 57: Re 62 Stipulation filed by Gold Club-SF, LLC, S.A.W. Entertainment, LTD. Motion Hearing reset to 1/12/2017 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/20/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
November 29, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND ORDER OF REFERENCE FOR ALL PURPOSES TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE BEELER re 47 Order; ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Beeler. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/29/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
November 22, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULING AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: REASSIGNMENT re 46 Case Management Statement filed by Gold Club-SF, LLC, S.A.W. Entertainment, LTD, Nicole Hughes, Penny Nunez, Angelynn Hermes. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Response due by 11/28/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/28/2016 is CONTINUED to Tuesday, 12/13/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/22/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
August 10, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING OSC AND GRANTING APPLICATION OF SHANNON LISS-RIORDAN FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE re 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Shannon Liss-Riordan ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10567866.) filed by Nicole Hughes. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/10/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2016)
July 25, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:APPLICATION OF SHANNON LISS-RIORDAN FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. Show Cause Response due by 8/5/2016. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/25/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes v. S.A.W. Entertainment, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Hughes
Represented By: Matthew David Carlson
Represented By: Michael Louis Freedman
Represented By: Shannon Liss-Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.A.W. Entertainment, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?