Brunker v. Bay Area Rapid Transit District

Plaintiff: Jodi Brunker
Defendant: Bay Area Rapid Transit District
Case Number: 3:2016cv03399
Filed: June 17, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 2, 2017 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 70 Stipulation for Approval of Settlement and Dismissal with Prejudice. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
November 30, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 42 Stipulation For Extension of Time to Conduct Private ADR. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2016)
September 29, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 29 Stipulation for Conditional Certification of FLSA Collective Action and Notification to Affected Individuals. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2016)
August 31, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 26 Stipulation selecting Private ADR. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brunker v. Bay Area Rapid Transit District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodi Brunker
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Ace Thomas Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Area Rapid Transit District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?